skip to content

Srikandarajah, Sanjho

CPSO#: 93565

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6520
Fax: 8557563454 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Don Mills Surgical
20 Wynford Dr
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 416-441-2111
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Baycrest Health Sciences
3560 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M6A2E1
Canada
Phone: 416-785-2500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjho Srikandarajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Srikandarajah ( CPSO# 93565 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANJHO SRIKANDARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRIKANDARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015