skip to content

Srigley, Jocelyn Andyss

CPSO#: 84706

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jocelyn Srigley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: BC Children's Hospital Laboratory Medicine Room 2J3 4500 Oak Street Vancouver BC V6H 3N1
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015