skip to content

Spurrell, Richard Mark

CPSO#: 95178

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital 501 Smyth Road Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 24 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017