skip to content

Springate, Russell Peter

CPSO#: 29540

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: HealthLink Cambridge 10 - 350 Conestoga Blvd Cambridge, Ontario N1R 7L7
Date Received: 01 Jun 2020


Instructions: Patients who wish to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Kunal Jagoowani at 519-740-5010.
Date Received: 28 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUSSELL PETER SPRINGATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRINGATE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1977