skip to content

Spring, Shanna

CPSO#: 90875

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontar
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600
Fax: 613-738-4298 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Laserderm
1600 Carling Ave Suite 650
Ottawa ON  K1Z 1G3
Canada
Phone: 613- 722-4436
Fax: 613-722-2877
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Vital Medical Centre
224 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON  K1V 1C1
Canada
Phone: (613) 248-1010
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shanna Spring Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Spring ( CPSO# 90875 )

Business Address:
650 - 1600 Carling Ave.
Ottawa ON  K1Z 1G3
Phone Number: (613) 722-4436

Business Address:
Vital Medical Center
224 Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K1V C1
Phone Number: 613-248-1010

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ontario

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHANNA SPRING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015