skip to content

Splinter, Karen Leigh Nicole

CPSO#: 94661

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1596 Regent St.
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z6
Phone: (705) 222-0492
Fax: (705) 222-7226 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E5J1
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Karen Splinter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Splinter ( CPSO# 94661 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
1596 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z6
Phone Number: (705) 222-0492

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREN LEIGH NICOLE SPLINTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPLINTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2011 to 05 Feb 2011
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012