skip to content

Spindler, Eric Eugene

CPSO#: 31726

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 12 Jan 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Jan 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus Health Records Department 1053 Carling Avenue Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 12 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:04 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Nov 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jan 2018