skip to content

Spicer, Tara Lee

CPSO#: 91094

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 - 1077 Golf Links Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A3
Phone: (807) 622-3995
Fax: (807) 622-3430 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. TL Spicer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Spicer ( CPSO# 91094 )

Business Address:
Golf Links Community Clinic
Unit 1
1077 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TARA LEE SPICER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPICER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011