skip to content

Spencer, Mandy Lee

CPSO#: 93741

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: (807) 468-3638 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mandy L. Spencer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Spencer ( CPSO# 93741 )

Business Address:
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Business Address:
Keewatin Medical Clinic
904 Ottawa Street
Keewatin ON  P0X 1C0
Phone Number: (807) 547-2818

Business Address:
Selkirk Regional Health Centre
120 Easton Drive
Selkirk MB  R1A 2M2
Phone Number: (204) 482-5800


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANDY LEE SPENCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENCER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 05 Jul 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
EL - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 02 Jun 2011 to 29 Jun 2011
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011