skip to content

Spencer, John Alan

CPSO#: 22594

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Nelson Medicine Professional Corporation 301 Victoria Avenue Fort Frances, Ontario P9A 3N5
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:25 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013