skip to content

Spence, Jessica Diana

CPSO#: 96749

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
St. Michael's Hospital
6 Donnelly South - Room 6-001
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jessica Spence Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Spence ( CPSO# 96749 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Anesthesia
Health Sciences Centre Room 2V2
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:02 Oct 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA DIANA SPENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2015 to 21 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018