skip to content

Spelliscy, Courtney Chloe Dunlop

CPSO#: 97763

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave, Toronto, ON M3M 0B
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Care Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Courtney Spelliscy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Spelliscy ( CPSO# 97763 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 21 Oct 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. COURTNEY CHLOE DUNLOP SPELLISCY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPELLISCY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015