skip to content

Spear, Allan Thorne

CPSO#: 19052

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Glazier Medical Center, 11 Gibb Street. Witby, ON L1H 2J9
Date Received: 28 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015