skip to content

Spacey, William Keith

CPSO#: 21562

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Feb 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Feb 1983