skip to content

Sowerby, Robert J

CPSO#: 93675

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vaughan Urology Associates
2630 Rutherford Road, Suite 201
Vaughan ON  L4K0H2
Phone: 905-832-8428
Fax: 905-832-6651 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

103-20 Wynford Dr
North York ON  M3C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 416-441-2111
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON  L6A 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 9038321212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Sowerby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sowerby ( CPSO# 93675 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3

Business Address:
3560 Bathurst Street
North York ON  M6A 2E1

Business Address:
201 - 2630 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2
Phone Number: (905) 832-8428

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT J SOWERBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOWERBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015