skip to content

Souza, Carolina Althoff

CPSO#: 85559

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Aug 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Aug 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal Do Parana, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Linden Terrace
Ottawa ON  K1S 1Z1
Phone: (613) 233-6027
Fax: (613) 737-8957 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73666
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C.A. Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Aug 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013 Active
             1.    Dr. Carolina Althoff Souza may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,  University  of  Ottawa,  in  which  Dr.  Souza holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.  Souza  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.