skip to content

Soutter, Donald Ian

CPSO#: 31457

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 May 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Sprucewood Drive
Thornhill ON  L3T 2P5
Phone: (416) 804-1885 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nancy K. Down Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Soutter ( CPSO# 31457 )
Dr. N. Down ( CPSO# 32556 )

Business Address:
218 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 491-0345


Corporation Name: D. Ian Soutter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Soutter ( CPSO# 31457 )
Dr. N. Down ( CPSO# 32556 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (416) 804-1885

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 804-1885

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can contact: Suite 611 - 581 Davis Drive, Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6, Tel: 905-853-4448.
Date Received: 18 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONALD IAN SOUTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUTTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1980