skip to content

Southcott, John David

CPSO#: 31853

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 20 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
20 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Elizabeth Hooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Southcott ( CPSO# 31853 )
Dr. E. Hooper ( CPSO# 50793 )
Dr. D. Southcott ( CPSO# 110997)

Business Address:
Leamington Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:14 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 May 2021