skip to content

Soudi, Nima

CPSO#: 97863

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nima Soudi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Soudi ( CPSO# 97863 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIMA SOUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2015