Soric, Stjepan (CPSO#: 100751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
106 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1Y7
Phone: 705-435-0077
Fax: 705-435-1177
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 Dunham Drive
Alliston ON  L9R 0G1
Canada
Phone: 705-434-2141
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

5292 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 5P9
Canada
Phone: 416-223-6666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stjepan Soric Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Soric ( CPSO# 100751)

Business Address:
106 Victoria Street West
2nd Floor
Alliston ON  L9R 1Y7
Phone Number: (705) 435-0077

Business Address:
30 Dunham Drive
Alliston ON  L9R 0G1
Phone Number: (705) 434-2141

Business Address:
5292 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2P 5P9
Phone Number: (416) 223-6666

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STJEPAN SORIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SORIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015