skip to content

Sorial, Mary Latif Riad

CPSO#: 86967

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: (905) 853-3702 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Sorial Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sorial ( CPSO# 86967 )

Business Address:
Unit C
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4
Phone Number: (905) 853-0404

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY LATIF RIAD SORIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SORIAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009