skip to content

Sorensen, Kyla Marie

CPSO#: 86376

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Sorensen, Kyla Marie (used until: 11 Feb 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1221 Lakeshore Rd, Suite 103
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1
Phone: (905) 333-8222
Fax: (905) 333-9343 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr, Kyla Ludlow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KYLA MARIE SORENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SORENSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2008 to 25 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009