skip to content

Soowamber, Medha Laichand

CPSO#: 97312

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Murray Strret, 2nd floor, Box#8
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: 416 586 4800 Ext. 5506
Fax: 647 427 2120 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Timmins and District Hospital
Rheumatology Clinic
700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 360-6016
Fax: (705) 360-6004
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. L. Soowamber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Soowamber ( CPSO# 97312 )

Business Address:
60 Murray Street
Second Floor, Box 8
Toronto ON  M5T 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 586-8766

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:27 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEDHA LAICHAND SOOWAMBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOWAMBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 27 Feb 2012 to 09 Mar 2012
EL - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2012 to 27 Jul 2012
EL - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014