skip to content

Sooknanan, Avita

CPSO#: 88541

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2200 West Wing
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 697-3607
Fax: (905) 697-3645 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clarington Urgent Care Clinic
2320 Highway 2
Bowmanville ON  L1C 3K7
Canada
Phone: (905) 697-1466
Fax: (905) 697-9592
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Bowmanville Urgent Care Clinic
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-6458
Fax: (905) 623-6486
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Avita Sooknanan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sooknanan ( CPSO# 88541 )

Business Address:
222 King Street East, West Wing
Suite 2200
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: 905-697-3607

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AVITA SOOKNANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOKNANAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010