skip to content

Sookdeo, Sunel

CPSO#: 85498

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Aug 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Department of Imaging
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58205
Fax: (905) 494-6614 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Finchgate X-ray and Ultrasound
40 Finchgate Blvd
Brampton
Brampton ON  L6T3J1
Canada
Phone: 905-7928440
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Sookdeo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sookdeo ( CPSO# 85498 )

Business Address:
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 792-8440

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Department of Imaging
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUNEL SOOKDEO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOKDEO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 15 Aug 2006 to 14 Aug 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2006