skip to content

Soodan, Baldev Singh

CPSO#: 30659

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 May 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Jammu University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Baldev Soodan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2018