skip to content

Sood, Rickesh

CPSO#: 86180

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2702
Fax: (519) 942-0483 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scope Clinic
470 Chrysler Drive, Units 11-15
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-7030
Fax: (905) 790-7487
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

WestGTA Endoscopy
Sheridan Centre
2225 Erin Mills Pk
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T8
Canada
Phone: (905) 823-0223
Fax: (905) 823-9780
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: 905-813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Sood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sood ( CPSO# 86180 )
Dr. S. Jha ( CPSO# 96272 )

Business Address:
West GTA Endoscopy
Suite 183
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 823-0223

Business Address:
470 Chrysler
Suite 11-15
Brampton ON  L6S 6G3
Phone Number: (905) 790-9030

Business Address:
Headwaters Healthcare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICKESH SOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 04 Jun 2007 to 29 Jun 2007
EL - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2007