skip to content

Soo, Victoria

CPSO#: 87568

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Bowman Gray of Wake Forest University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone: (519) 473-6654 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 406
140 Oxford St E
London ON  N6A 5R9
Canada
Phone: (519) 204-3959
Fax: (519) 438-2400
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Victoria Soo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Soo ( CPSO# 87568 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone Number: (519) 473-6654

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VICTORIA SOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009