skip to content

Sonty, Sreepadma Priya

CPSO#: 93508

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northwestern University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 31 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 28 Aug 2012 to 31 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016