skip to content

Song, Howard Ha-Il

CPSO#: 85004

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Park Healthcare Centre
Tuberculosis Service
Respiratory Department, Rm 126
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone: (416) 243-3600 Ext. 2180
Fax: (416) 243-3696 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HOWARD HA-IL SONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010