skip to content

Song, Helen Bo

CPSO#: 84898

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Xuzhou Medical College, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
403 Arkell Road
Guelph ON  N1L 1E5
Phone: (519) 822-7831
Fax: (519) 822-6234 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Helen B. Song Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Song ( CPSO# 84898 )

Business Address:
Unit 4
403 Arkell Road
Guelph ON  N1L 1E5
Phone Number: (519) 822-7831

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HELEN BO SONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008