skip to content

Somasundaram, Nilany

CPSO#: 96546

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Nottingham, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King City Medical Associate
20 Doctors Lane, BOX 370
King City ON  L7B 1A6
Phone: 9058335381
Fax: 9058335649 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nilany Somasundaram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NILANY SOMASUNDARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMASUNDARAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2011 to 02 Oct 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2011 to 10 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013