skip to content

Somani, Shayan

CPSO#: 90646

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: 4164696590
Fax: 4164696591 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Somani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Somani ( CPSO# 90646 )

Business Address:
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone Number: (416) 654-5437

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6590

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAYAN SOMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013