skip to content

Solomon, Matthew Aaron Lent

CPSO#: 98227

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

658 Second Line W
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6C2K9
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Barbara Lent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2018
Corporation Name: Solomon Perry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Solomon ( CPSO# 98227 )
Dr. L. Perry ( CPSO# 99402 )

Business Address:
205 Mcnabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y3
Phone Number: (705) 945-5050

Business Address:
443 Northern Avenue East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 4J3
Phone Number: (705) 759-2554

Business Address:
658 Second Line West
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6C 2K9

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW AARON LENT SOLOMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLOMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2015