skip to content

Solomon, Leslie Vasile

CPSO#: 25793

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1483 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 1E1
Phone: (905) 523-1616
Fax: (905) 523-6114 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Leslie Solomon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Solomon ( CPSO# 25793 )

Business Address:
1483 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1E1
Phone Number: (905) 523-6114

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LESLIE VASILE SOLOMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLOMON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1973