skip to content

Sollazzo, John Nicholas

CPSO#: 86684

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
30 the Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2757 King St. East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34812
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Ave. E.
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 33997
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sollazzo & Palombo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Palombo ( CPSO# 86647 )
Dr. J. Sollazzo ( CPSO# 86684 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Brameast Family Health Organization
38 - 2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 792-2211

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN NICHOLAS SOLLAZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLLAZZO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009