skip to content

Solano Salazar, Tanya Gisela

CPSO#: 91866

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Costa Rica, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics 3AHSC
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75155
Fax: (905) 524-5707 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tanya Solano Salazar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Solano Salazar ( CPSO# 91866 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
3A HSC
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L3N 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:01 Aug 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 17 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 18 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2019 Active
             Dr. Tanya Gisela Solano Salazar may practise medicine independently in
            pediatric emergency medicine.