skip to content

Goldstein, Sol Julian

CPSO#: 21457

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Sep 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Apr 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:Dalhousie University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
254 Viewmount Avenue
Toronto ON  M6B 1V2
Phone: (416) 929-3287
Fax: (416) 929-5832 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Strawberry Lane
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Canada
Phone: (705) 368-1896
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sol Goldstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Goldstein ( CPSO# 21457 )

Business Address:
254 Viewmount Avenue
Toronto ON  M6B 1V2
Phone Number: (416) 929-3287

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 16 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2019
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 27 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2019 Active
             (1 of 2) 

            As from 12:00 p.m., June 19, 2019, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sol
            Julian Goldstein:

                  a.    Dr. Goldstein shall comply with the College Policy #2-07 "Practice
                        Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise,
                        Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to
                        Relocation", a copy of which is attached at Schedule "A" to this
                        Order;
            PROBE Program

                  b.    Dr. Goldstein shall participate in and unconditionally pass the
                        PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for
                        Personalized Education for Professionals, with a report or reports
                        to be provided by the provider to the College regarding Dr.
                        Goldstein's progress and compliance. Dr. Goldstein shall complete
                        this requirement within six (6 months) of the date of this Order.
                  
            Clinical Supervision 

                  c.    Within twenty (20) days of this Order, Dr. Goldstein shall retain a
                        College-approved clinical supervisor or supervisors (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor") with respect to his psychiatry practice, who has
                        signed an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Schedule "B".
                  
                  d.    For a period of twelve (12) months commencing on the date that Dr.
                        Goldstein resumes practice following the suspension of his
                        certificate of registration, Dr. Goldstein may practise psychiatry
                        only under the supervision of the Clinical Supervisor ("Clinical
                        Supervision"), who shall facilitate the education program set out
                        in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                        Schedule "C"; as follows:  
                  
                  e.    For an initial period of two (2) months, Dr. Goldstein will meet
                        with the Clinical Supervisor every week, at which meetings the
                        Clinical Supervisor will: 
                  
                        i.    review a minimum fifteen (15) of Dr. Goldstein's patient
                              records, to be selected at the sole discretion of the
                              Clinical Supervisor, and the associated OHIP claims
                              submissions or planned OHIP claims submissions, and discuss
                              any issues or concerns arising from this review with Dr.
                              Goldstein;
                        ii.   make recommendations to Dr. Goldstein for practice
                              improvements and ongoing professional development, and
                              inquire into Dr. Goldstein's compliance with the
                              recommendations; and
                        iii.  keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient
                              identifiers.  
                  
                  f.    After the initial period of two (2) months, if the Clinical
                        Supervisor is satisfied that Dr. Goldstein's patient records and
                        associated OHIP billings reflect the knowledge, skills and judgment
                        necessary for Dr. Goldstein to practise in a less highly supervised
                        environment, the Clinical Supervisor may recommend to the College
                        that supervision be reduced for the balance of the Clinical
                        Supervision period of twelve (12) months.
                  
                  g.    Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and approval of
                        the College of a reduction in supervision, Dr. Goldstein will meet
                        with the Clinical Supervisor every month, at which meetings the
                        Clinical Supervisor will: 
                  
                        i.    review a minimum fifteen (15) of Dr. Goldstein's patient
                              records, to be selected at the sole discretion of the
                              Clinical Supervisor, and the associated OHIP claims
                              submissions or planned OHIP claims submissions, and discuss
                              any issues or concerns arising from this review with Dr.
                              Goldstein;
                        ii.   make recommendations to Dr. Goldstein for practice
                              improvements and ongoing professional development, and
                              inquire into Dr. Goldstein's compliance with the
                              recommendations; and
                        iii.  keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient
                              identifiers.  
                  
            Other Elements of Clinical Supervision  

                  h.    Throughout the period of Clinical Supervision, Dr. Goldstein shall
                        abide by all recommendations of his Clinical Supervisor regarding
                        his recordkeeping and OHIP billing, practice improvements, and
                        ongoing professional development.
                  
                  i.    The Clinical Supervisor shall submit written reports to the College
                        at least once every month, or more frequently if the Clinical
                        Supervisor has concerns about Dr. Goldstein's standard of practice.
                  
                  j.    If a person who has given an undertaking in Schedule "A" to this
                        Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions,
                        Dr. Goldstein shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of
                        the same, ensure that an executed undertaking is delivered to the
                        College in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is
                        acceptable to the College.
                  
                  k.    If Dr. Goldstein is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor as set
                        out in this Order, he shall cease practising medicine until he has
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  l.    If Dr. Goldstein is required to cease to practise medicine as a
                        result of section (5)(k) above, this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on his certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            Reassessment of Practice 

                  m.    Approximately six (6) months after the completion of Clinical
                        Supervision, Dr. Goldstein shall undergo a reassessment of practice
                        by a College-appointed assessor (the "Assessor").  The
                        re-assessment shall include a review of Dr. Goldstein's patient
                        charts and associated OHIP claims submissions or planned OHIP
                        claims submissions.  The results of the re-assessment shall be
                        reported to the College.
                  
                  n.    Dr. Goldstein shall consent to such sharing of information among
                        the Assessor, the Clinical Supervisor, and the College, as any of
                        them deem necessary or desirable in order to fulfill their
                        respective obligations.
                  
            Monitoring 

                  o.    Dr. Goldstein shall inform the College of each and every location
                        where he practises, in any jurisdiction (his "Practice
                        Location(s)") within fifteen (15) days of this Order and shall
                        inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                        fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  p.    Dr. Goldstein shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his
                        practice, patient charts and OHIP claims submissions by a College
                        representative(s) for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his
                        compliance with the terms of this Order.
                  
                  q.    Dr. Goldstein shall consent to the College's making appropriate
                        enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor and enforce his compliance with the terms of
                        this Order.
                  
                  r.    Dr. Goldstein shall be responsible for any and all costs associated
                        with implementing the terms of this Order.
                  
            (2 of 2)

            As from April 16, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sol Julian
            Goldstein, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Goldstein
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. SOL JULIAN GOLDSTEIN
                                          ("Dr. Goldstein")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;

                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Goldstein, certificate of registration number 21457, am a member
                  of the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Goldstein, acknowledge that on April 16, 2018, the ICR Committee
                  directed me to participate in a Specified Continuing Education and
                  Remediation Program (the "SCERP") in resolution of investigations bearing
                  File Numbers 461983, 461987, 461996 and 462001 (the "Investigations")
                  into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent
                  in my psychiatry practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Goldstein, acknowledge that I am entering into this Undertaking in
                  lieu of completing the SCERP.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Goldstein, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR
                  Committee "Effective Date".

            (6)   Practice Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goldstein, undertake that:

                        (i)   I will not conduct any new assessments of, nor provide
                              treatment to, individuals who I believe have been subject to
                              or have engaged in parental alienation;
                  
                        (ii)  I will not provide opinion evidence about parental alienation
                              to any third party, whether orally or in writing, in regards
                              to individuals I have assessed or treated, except as required
                              by law, in which case I will advise the relevant parties, in
                              advance of providing such opinion evidence, to consult the
                              College's Public Register;
                  
                        (iii) I will inform any individuals whom I am currently assessing
                              and/or treating who I believe have been subject to or have
                              engaged in parental alienation, that I can no longer be
                              involved in their assessment and/or treatment and that I
                              cannot provide opinion evidence about parental alienation to
                              any third party.  I will comply with the College's Policy on
                              Ending the Physician-Patient Relationship.  In any event, I
                              will not provide any further services to these individuals
                              after sixty (60) days from the date upon which I sign this
                              Undertaking; 
                  
                        (iv)  I will, in the opening meeting or phone call with counsel
                              and/or the parties in any new custody/access assessment,
                              address the issue of whether the case in question has
                              elements of parental alienation.  If so, I will promptly
                              inform counsel and/or the parties that I cannot be involved
                              in the assessment;
                  
                        (v)   If, during any on-going custody/access assessment, I have
                              reasonable grounds to believe that any individual who I am
                              assessing has been subject to or has engaged in parental
                              alienation, I will immediately discontinue the assessment and
                              I will promptly inform counsel and/or the parties that I
                              cannot be involved in the assessment and that I cannot
                              provide opinion evidence about parental alienation to any
                              third party;
                  
                        (vi)  I will, in the opening meeting with any individual seeking
                              treatment, address whether the issue(s) for which the
                              individual is seeking treatment has elements of parental
                              alienation.  If so, I will promptly inform the individual
                              that I cannot be involved in his or her treatment;
                  
                        (vii) If, during on-going treatment, I have reasonable grounds to
                              believe that any patient who I am treating has been subject
                              to or has engaged in parental alienation, I will immediately
                              discontinue treatment and end the physician-patient
                              relationship in accordance with the College's Policy on
                              Ending the Physician-Patient Relationship. I will also inform
                              the patient that I cannot provide opinion evidence about
                              parental alienation to any third party.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goldstein, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Register for and attend the Association of Family and
                              Conciliation Courts 56th Annual Conference "The Future of
                              Family Justice: International Innovations":
                              https://www.afccnet.org/Conferences-Training/AFCC-Conferences/ctl/ViewConference/ConferenceID/158/mid/615; 
                  
                        (ii)  Review and prepare written summaries of the following
                              resources:
                  
                              a.    College policy #4-12, Medical Records;
                              b.    College policy #7-12, Medical Expert:  Reports and
                                    Testimony;
                              c.    Association of Family and Conciliation Courts:  Model
                                    Standards of Practice for Child Custody Evaluation.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goldstein, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education set out at
                        Section 7(1)(i), including proof of registration and attendance and
                        any participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of
                        completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in
                        its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goldstein, undertake to complete the requirement set out at
                        Section 7(a)(ii) byJuly 1, 2019.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goldstein, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goldstein, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goldstein, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.

                  (d)   I, Dr. Goldstein, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form attached hereto as Appendix "B". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Goldstein, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Goldstein, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Goldstein, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Goldstein, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Goldstein, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Goldstein, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goldstein, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goldstein, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              College investigations were conducted into whether Dr.
                              Goldstein engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent in his psychiatry practice. As a result of the
                              investigations:
                  
                                    Dr. Goldstein will engage in professional education in
                                    medical record-keeping and child custody and access
                                    assessments.
                  
                                    Dr. Goldstein will not conduct any new assessments of,
                                    nor provide treatment to, individuals who have been
                                    subject to or have engaged in parental alienation.
                  
                                    Dr. Goldstein will not provide opinion evidence about
                                    parental alienation to any third party, whether orally
                                    or in writing, in regards to individuals he has
                                    assessed or treated, except as required by law, in
                                    which case Dr. Goldstein will advise the relevant
                                    parties, in advance of providing such opinion evidence,
                                    to consult the College's Public Register.
                  
                                    Dr. Goldstein will terminate his professional
                                    relationship with any individuals who he is currently
                                    assessing and/or treating who have been subject to or
                                    have engaged in parental alienation.
                  
                                    Dr. Goldstein will have in place a process to screen
                                    incoming assessments and patients for elements of
                                    parental alienation and to terminate assessments and/or
                                    patients where elements of parental alienation become
                                    apparent after the professional relationship has
                                    commenced.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Goldstein, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Goldstein, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education and to all Chiefs
                  of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the
                  following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jun 2019
Summary:

On June 19th, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Goldstein committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, and that he failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession. 
  
 Background 
  
 Dr. Goldstein is an 80-year-old psychiatrist practicing in Toronto, Ontario, who received his 
 certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in 1968. 
  
 On the basis of information received from the Health Services Branch of the Ontario Ministry 
 of Health and Long-Term Care (the “Ministry”) identifying concerns with Dr.  Goldstein’s 
 recordkeeping and billing practices, as well as other information, the College commenced an 
 investigation under section 75(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code to obtain a 
 broader view of Dr. Goldstein’s psychiatry practice. 
 
Investigation of Dr. Goldstein’s Practice 
 
The College retained Dr. Ahmed Boachie (“Dr. Boachie”), a psychiatrist and Assistant 
Professor in the Department of Psychiatry at the University of Toronto, to opine on Dr. 
Goldstein’s psychiatry practice including his documentation and billing practices. Dr. Boachie 
reviewed 24 patient charts, the associated OHIP billing for 21 patients, and certain other 
information. 
 
Dr. Boachie opined that Dr. Goldstein’s documentation practices fell below the standard of 
practice of the profession in all 24 of the charts reviewed. In particular, he noted that: 
 
       There is a clear pattern for concern regarding Dr. Goldstein’s assessment, 
       documentation, and billing practices. It is practically ubiquitous that: 
        
       a)    Notes are handwritten and difficult to decipher...; 
       b)    Notes are very short, or sometimes there is no note at all, but only a date and 
             time period for the appointment; and 
       c)    Although Dr. Goldstein can clearly assess and formulate mental health 
             disorders, as is evident when he writes letters regarding patients for insurance 
             or legal purposes, there are no assessment notes or formulations written in the 
             chart notes. Nor are there treatment plans. 
        
       These practices would make it very difficult for another psychiatrist to take over care of 
       one of Dr.Goldstein’s patients, should he be unavailable to them. These documentation 
       practices do not meet minimum standards of care. 
  
 Dr. Boachie also opined that Dr. Goldstein’s billing practices failed to meet the standard of 
 practice of the profession. He noted: 
  
      With regard to billing practices, there were numerous cases in which dates of treatment 
      that were billed to OHIP did not have corresponding dates and/or chart notes in the 
      patients’ files. In some cases, billing dates were not in sequence, not even roughly in 
      sequence, but all over the place. These concerns require further investigation. 
 
Dr. Boachie interviewed Dr. Goldstein and submitted a further report following that interview. 
He noted that: 
 
      Dr. Goldstein appeared to have a very good memory of events when prompted, but 
      because of inadequate documentation there were still certain cases where we could not 
      get a clear idea why many decisions were made. He could also not give any appropriate 
      explanation for the discrepancies in OHIP billing described in my first report. 
 
Dr. Boachie, in his reports, raised certain issues with regard to Dr. Goldstein’s patient charts in 
assessments conducted for use in family court or in cases of family conflict. As Dr. Boachie did 
not practice in this area, the College retained Dr. Anthony Pignatiello, the Associate 
Psychiatrist-in-Chief at the Hospital for Sick Children, to review certain patient records 
previously reviewed by Dr. Boachie. Dr. Pignatiello reviewed five patient charts and 
interviewed Dr. Goldstein. 
 
As with Dr. Boachie, Dr. Pignatiello’s review identified issues related to Dr. Goldstein’s 
documentation and billing. In particular, in his report Dr. Pignatiello commented: 
 
      The patient files of Dr. Goldstein reviewed were consistently very disorganized, unclear, 
      vague, often times with scant information provided. In some sections dates of service 
      were identified; however, no content was written. Two of the files had beginning 
      elements of an assessment note whereas with others there was no evidence of any 
      assessment. There was no clear approach to an impression, formulation or clear 
      management plan, nor was there any periodic review of the service provided or further 
      plans of action… There was also unclear documentation required for billing purposes 
 
Dr. Goldstein’s inadequate documentation and billing as set out in the reports of Dr. Boachie 
and Dr. Pignatiello is unprofessional. 
 
Relevant History 
 
On August 27, 1999, the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”), 
based on the recommendation of the Medical Review Committee of the College (the “MRC”), 
directed Dr. Goldstein to reimburse OHIP for billing in the amount of $54,705.49.  
 
Plea of No Contest 
 
Dr. Goldstein does not contest the above facts. Dr. Goldstein does not contest that these facts 
constitute professional misconduct, in that: 
 
      a)    he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
       having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
       disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, under paragraph 1(1)33 of O. Reg. 
       856/93; and  
  
       b)    he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of  
       patients, under paragraph 1(1)2 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the 
       Medicine  Act, 1991. 
  
 Agreed Statement of Facts Relevant to Penalty 

 In 2013, the Health Services Branch of the Ontario Ministry of Health and Long-Term Care (the 
 “Ministry”) requested repayment by Dr. Goldstein of certain OHIP claims in the amount of 
 $10,740, comprising those claims without any corresponding patient record for the encounter 
 billed, and those claims where the records were created months after the patient encounter.  
 Dr. Goldstein repaid approximately $7,500, comprising only those claims without any 
 corresponding patient record for the encounter billed. 
 
Disposition 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered that: 
  
    -  Dr. Goldstein attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 

    -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Goldstein’s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) 
       months, commencing from June 27, 2019 at 12:01am. 

    -  The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Goldstein’s 
       certificate of registration: 

        a.   Dr. Goldstein shall comply with the College Policy #2-07 “Practice Management 
             Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of 
             Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation”, a copy of which is attached 
             at Schedule “A” to this Order; 

       PROBE Program 

        b.   Dr. Goldstein shall participate in and unconditionally pass the PROBE Ethics & 
             Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for 
             Professionals, with a report or reports to be provided by the provider to the 
             College regarding Dr. Goldstein’s progress and compliance. Dr. Goldstein shall 
             complete this requirement within six (6 months) of the date of this Order. 

       Clinical Supervision  

        c.   Within twenty (20) days of this Order, Dr. Goldstein shall retain a College-
             approved clinical supervisor or supervisors (the “Clinical Supervisor”) with 
     respect to his psychiatry practice, who has signed an undertaking in the form 
     attached hereto as Schedule “B”. 

d.   For a period of twelve (12) months commencing on the date that Dr. Goldstein 
     resumes practice following the suspension of his certificate of registration, Dr. 
     Goldstein may practise psychiatry only under the supervision of the Clinical 
     Supervisor (“Clinical Supervision”), who shall facilitate the education program 
     set out in the Individualized Education Plan (“IEP”), attached hereto as Schedule 
     “C”; as follows:   

e.   For an initial period of two (2) months, Dr. Goldstein will meet with the Clinical 
     Supervisor every week, at which meetings the Clinical Supervisor will:  

         i.    review a minimum fifteen (15) of Dr. Goldstein’s patient records, to 
               be selected at the sole discretion of the Clinical Supervisor, and the 
               associated OHIP claims submissions or planned OHIP claims 
               submissions, and discuss any issues or concerns arising from this 
               review with Dr. Goldstein; 

         ii.   make recommendations to Dr. Goldstein for practice improvements 
               and ongoing professional development, and inquire into Dr. 
               Goldstein’s compliance with the recommendations; and 

        iii.   keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient 
               identifiers.   

f.   After the initial period of two (2) months, if the Clinical Supervisor is satisfied 
     that Dr. Goldstein’s patient records and associated OHIP billings reflect the 
     knowledge, skills and judgment necessary for Dr. Goldstein to practise in a less 
     highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor may recommend to the 
     College that supervision be reduced for the balance of the Clinical Supervision 
     period of twelve (12) months. 

g.   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and approval of the College 
     of a reduction in supervision, Dr. Goldstein will meet with the Clinical Supervisor 
     every month, at which meetings the Clinical Supervisor will:  

           i.  review a minimum fifteen (15) of Dr. Goldstein’s patient records, to 
               be selected at the sole discretion of the Clinical Supervisor, and the 
               associated OHIP claims submissions or planned OHIP claims 
               submissions, and discuss any issues or concerns arising from this 
               review with Dr. Goldstein; 

          ii.  make recommendations to Dr. Goldstein for practice improvements 
               and ongoing professional development, and inquire into Dr. 
               Goldstein’s compliance with the recommendations; and 
            iii. keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with patient 
                 identifiers.   

 Other Elements of Clinical Supervision   

  h.   Throughout the period of Clinical Supervision, Dr. Goldstein shall abide by all 
       recommendations of his Clinical Supervisor regarding his recordkeeping and 
       OHIP billing, practice improvements, and ongoing professional development. 

  i.   The Clinical Supervisor shall submit written reports to the College at least once 
       every month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about Dr. 
       Goldstein’s standard of practice. 

  j.   If a person who has given an undertaking in Schedule “A” to this Order is unable 
       or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, Dr. Goldstein shall, within twenty 
       (20) days of receiving notice of the same, ensure that an executed undertaking is 
       delivered to the College in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is 
       acceptable to the College. 

  k.   If Dr. Goldstein is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor as set out in this Order, 
       he shall cease practising medicine until he has obtained a Clinical Supervisor 
       acceptable to the College. 

  l.   If Dr. Goldstein is required to cease to practise medicine as a result of section 
       (5)(k) above, this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on his certificate 
       of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public 
       register. 

Reassessment of Practice  

  m.   Approximately six (6) months after the completion of Clinical Supervision, Dr. 
       Goldstein shall undergo a reassessment of practice by a College-appointed 
       assessor (the “Assessor”). The re-assessment shall include a review of Dr. 
       Goldstein’s patient charts and associated OHIP claims submissions or planned 
       OHIP claims submissions. The results of the re-assessment shall be reported to 
       the College. 

  n.   Dr. Goldstein shall consent to such sharing of information among the Assessor, 
       the Clinical Supervisor, and the College, as any of them deem necessary or 
       desirable in order to fulfill their respective obligations. 

Monitoring  

  o.   Dr. Goldstein shall inform the College of each and every location where he 
       practises, in any jurisdiction (his “Practice Location(s)”) within fifteen (15) days 
       of this Order and shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations 
       within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location. 
     p.   Dr. Goldstein shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice, 
          patient charts and OHIP claims submissions by a College representative(s) for the 
          purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order. 

     q.   Dr. Goldstein shall consent to the College’s making appropriate enquiries of the 
          Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution that may have 
          relevant information, in order for the College to monitor and enforce his 
          compliance with the terms of this Order. 

     r.   Dr. Goldstein shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with 
          implementing the terms of this Order. 

-  Dr. Goldstein pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the 
   date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): June 19, 2019 at 9:00 a.m.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: April 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sol Julian Goldstein to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 16, 2019:

College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Goldstein engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his psychiatry practice. As a result of the investigations:

Dr. Goldstein will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping and child custody and access assessments.

Dr. Goldstein will not conduct any new assessments of, nor provide treatment to, individuals who have been subject to or have engaged in parental alienation.

Dr. Goldstein will not provide opinion evidence about parental alienation to any third party, whether orally or in writing, in regards to individuals he has assessed or treated, except as required by law, in which case Dr. Goldstein will advise the relevant parties, in advance of providing such opinion evidence, to consult the College’s Public Register.

Dr. Goldstein will terminate his professional relationship with any individuals who he is currently assessing and/or treating who have been subject to or have engaged in parental alienation.

Dr. Goldstein will have in place a process to screen incoming assessments and patients for elements of parental alienation and to terminate assessments and/or patients where elements of parental alienation become apparent after the professional relationship has commenced.

 

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)