skip to content

Sokolova, Elena Anatolievna

CPSO#: 97119

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:MOSCOW MEDICAL STOMATOLOGY INSTITUTE, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-0185
Fax: (416) 289-0187 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: (416)281-7438
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W3W3
Canada
Phone: 4164952558
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Elena Sokolova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sokolova ( CPSO# 97119 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-0185

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:20 Dec 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013 Active
 Dr.   Elena   Anatolievna  Sokolova  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            neurology, only.