skip to content

Sohal, Jasdeep Singh

CPSO#: 94045

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Pune, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 - Broadway St
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone: 519 842 4231 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jasdeep Sohal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sohal ( CPSO# 94045 )

Business Address:
13 - 200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone Number: (519) 842-4231

Business Address:
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JASDEEP SINGH SOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Dec 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 30 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 07 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012