skip to content

Sogbein, Olusola Olufemi

CPSO#: 86906

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 11 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 May 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 May 2013
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 May 2013
Summary:

On May 13, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Olusola Olufemi Sogbein committed an act of professional misconduct in that: he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; and in that he engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician. Dr. Sogbein admitted the allegations.

Dr. Sogbein is a postgraduate medical student at a University and holds a certificate of registration authorizing postgraduate education, issued on July 1, 2007.


On August 31, 2007, Dr. Sogbein was stopped by police who were notified of a concern regarding his driving. He was issued a caution for passing off the roadway Dr. Sogbein pulled his car beside that of the complainants and made a comment to the effect of wanting to get a good look at their faces so if they ever come into an emergency room where he is working he won't help them.

On August 16, 2008, Dr. Sogbein was arrested and charged with causing a disturbance arising from a traffic stop. He was rude, made derogatory comments and was intimidating towards the female officer who stopped him. The Cause Disturbance Charge was ultimately withdrawn.

On April 16, 2009, Dr. Sogbein was involved in an incident involving Nurse A and Patient A at Hospital Y. Nurse A made an unintentional comment related to Dr. Sogbein's skin colour in the context of a clinical inquiry. Dr. Sogbein became angry further to Nurse A's comment. In reaction, he opened a curtain surrounding Patient A's bed, thereby potentially exposing Patient A to the hall and to any passersby, including exposing her groin wound and vaginal area. Nurse A provided an apology to him and was sent to training. Dr. Sogbein's privileges to continue his postgraduate education at the Hospital were terminated on April 30, 2009. He was required to participate in a remediation program focusing on anger management; communication skills; medical content knowledge and professionalism. After a successful remediation period, his privileges were re-instated in December 2009.

On September 15, 2010, Dr. Sogbein pled guilty and was convicted of driving a motor vehicle on a highway while his driver's license was under suspension. He received a $1000 fine and a further six months driving suspension. On October 10, 2010, Dr. Sogbein pled guilty and was convicted of operating a motor vehicle on a highway in a manner that was dangerous to the public on September 20, 2009. He received a $1000 fine and a one year driving prohibition.

Dr. Sogbein began a residency program at Hospital Z in April of 2012. During his Internal Care Unit rotation, Dr. Sogbein was disrespectful and unprofessional in his interactions an ICU Pharmacist (subsequently and unprompted he admitted to her that he had been wrong), with an ICU Ward Clerk, with an ICU nurse who was inquiring about pacer pads, nursing staff on June 24, 2012, a cable installer on June 27, 2012, and on June 19, 2012, he discontinued orders for a patient issued by the Chief of Medicine and Critical Care without reviewing the issue with the ordering physician or the attending physician.

The University suspended Dr. Sogbein from clinical duties effective July 9, 2012 for unprofessional behaviour. 
The Committee ordered and directed that:

the Registrar suspend Dr. Sogbein's certificate of registration for a period of four months,
commencing June 1, 2013.

the following terms, conditions and limitations be imposed on Dr. Sogbein's certificate of
registration authorizing postgraduate education:

a) Dr. Olusola Olufemi Sogbein shall practice in a group setting (that includes other
physicians) only;

b) Dr. Olusola Olufemi Sogbein shall advise the College in writing, immediately, if
he is charged with any provincial or criminal offense;

c) Dr. Olusola Olufemi Sogbein shall, at his own expense:

(i) practise under a workplace monitoring arrangement approved by the
College, with quarterly reports to the College;
(ii) participate in individual or group counselling sessions as approved by the
College, with quarterly reports to the College and
(iii) enter into an agreement with the Physician Workplace Support Program
(PWSP), with quarterly reports to the College and shall comply with the
PWSP recommendations.

d) Dr. Sogbein shall consent to information-sharing/reporting between the College
and the workplace monitors, the counsellors and the PWSP, as well as any other
persons necessary in order for the College to receive information relevant to his
compliance with these or any other terms of the order.

Dr. Sogbein appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

Dr. Sogbein pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 by August 13, 2013.
 
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 13, 2013