skip to content

So, Anthony Chi Long

CPSO#: 96092

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 5292 Yonge St North York, Ontario M2N 5P9
Date Received: 07 Jul 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:06 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2020