skip to content

Snyder, Donna Albina

CPSO#: 28841

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 04 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Apr 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Safe-Stor Fonthill, ON L0S 1E6 Tel: 905 892 0010
Date Received: 28 Aug 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Mar 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Apr 2017