skip to content

Sniderman, Kenneth Wilfred

CPSO#: 23607

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 19 Feb 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jun 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kenneth W. Sniderman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: 29 Lower Village Gate Toronto ON M5P 3L7
Date Received: 18 Feb 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Feb 2020