skip to content

Snelgrove, Natasha Marie

CPSO#: 95795

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Family Health Team
123 James St N
Suite 300
Hamilton ON  L8R 2K8
Phone: (905) 667-4848 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Family Health Team
Hamilton CHC
414 Victoria Ave N
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Canada
Phone: (905) 667-4848
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Community Psychiatry Clinic
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th St
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E3
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

50 Charlton Ave E
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Psychiatric Emergency Service
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Natasha Snelgrove Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Snelgrove ( CPSO# 95795 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
Injured Workers' Clinic
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E3

Business Address:
McMaster University Student Wellness Centre
Student Centre, Room B101
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4S4
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Business Address:
123 James St N
Hamilton FHT
Hamilton ON  L8R 2K8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATASHA MARIE SNELGROVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNELGROVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016