skip to content

Snelgrove, John Wilkinson

CPSO#: 95395

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 University Ave
3rd Floor, Rm. 3-914
Toronto ON  M5G1Z5
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 2701
Fax: 416-586-8740 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. John W. Snelgrove Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Snelgrove ( CPSO# 95395 )

Business Address:
20 Erb St W
Suite 1004
Waterloo ON  N2L 1T2
Phone Number: (519) 746-1511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN WILKINSON SNELGROVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNELGROVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016