skip to content

Smithies, Mila

CPSO#: 99497

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
152 Cleopatra Drive
Suite 101
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone: 613-728-6212
Fax: 613-728-3866 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mila Smithies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Smithies ( CPSO# 99497 )

Business Address:
101-152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone Number: (613) 728-6212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MILA SMITHIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITHIES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2012 to 11 Nov 2012
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 12 Nov 2012 to 07 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 26 Jun 2015
Elective Trainee - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2017