skip to content

Smith, William Gary

CPSO#: 28616

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Nov 2020
EXPIRY DATE
02 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. W. Gary Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 21 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Timmins and District Hospital Medical Records 700 Ross Ave E Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Date Received: 25 Nov 2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:22 May 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Nov 2020