skip to content

Smith, Vivien Anne

CPSO#: 22909

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vivien Anne Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2007
Corporation Name: Vivien Anne Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 18 2008
Corporation Name: Vivien Anne Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Smith ( CPSO# 22909 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
110 Lowther Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 519-3685

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Sep 2020