skip to content

Smith, Shane Alexander

CPSO#: 90755

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Division of General Surgery
399 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shane Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Smith ( CPSO# 90755 )

Business Address:
399 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHANE ALEXANDER SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2014